skip to content

Borgono, Carla Andrea

CPSO#: 93371

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 1 905-472-7000 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 1 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Carla A. Borgono Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Borgono ( CPSO# 93371 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARLA ANDREA BORGONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORGONO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2015