skip to content

Borger, Jonathan Ronald

CPSO#: 87403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road B3 218
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Borger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Borger ( CPSO# 87403 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
PO Box 5339
339 Windermere Road B3 218
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN RONALD BORGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 09 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 09 Jul 2009 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011