skip to content

Borek, Robert Joseph

CPSO#: 30077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Lyndock Street
P O Box 818
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone: (519) 862-1461
Fax: (519) 862-5835 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert J. Borek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Borek ( CPSO# 30077 )

Business Address:
348 Lyndock Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 862-1461

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH BOREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOREK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2018