skip to content

Borduas, Melissa

CPSO#: 106254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HGH Mental Health and Addictions
580 Spence Ave
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 0B4
Phone: (844) 304-1414 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:26 Aug 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA BORDUAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDUAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Aug 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020