skip to content

Bookman, Arthur Allan Melvin

CPSO#: 22099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
1E452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5404
Fax: (416) 603-4348 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. A. M. Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bookman ( CPSO# 22099 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 1E-452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARTHUR ALLAN MELVIN BOOKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOKMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1969