skip to content

Bonifacio, Herbert Joseph

CPSO#: 91793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 813-8859
Fax: 416-867-3736 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HERBERT JOSEPH BONIFACIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIFACIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009