skip to content

Bonaparte, James Patrick

CPSO#: 86476

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105-A
460 W Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON  K2E 0B8
Phone: (613) 369-8369
Fax: (613) 369-8354 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place District Hospital
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James P. Bonaparte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bonaparte ( CPSO# 86476 )

Business Address:
105A - 460 West Hunt Club Rd
Nepean ON  K2E 0B8
Phone Number: 613-369-8369

Business Address:
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK BONAPARTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONAPARTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012