skip to content

Bonan, Raoul Isaac

CPSO#: 90026

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2015