skip to content

Bombin, Victoria Elisa

CPSO#: 89259

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victoria Bombin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patient records stayed with the owner of the clinic, Mr. George Oduro, Pharmacist. Patients may write to the clinic address at Rymal Medical Clinic, 2247 Rymal Road, Stoney Creek, ON L8J 2V8. If unsuccessful, please contact the College of Pharmacists and/or the Information and Privacy Commissioners Office.
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015


Address: Rymal Medical Clinic 2247 Rymal Road Stoney Creek ON L8J 2V8 Attention: Record Request Dr. Bombin
Instructions: Please send requests to the address above.
Date Received: 10 Nov 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Mar 2014