skip to content

Bollinger, Megan Loren

CPSO#: 97755

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Authority c/o Primary Health Care
PO Box 1300
61 Queen Street Main Floor
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: 807-737-5166
Fax: 807-737-4364 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Bollinger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bollinger ( CPSO# 97755 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care
61 Queen Street Main Floor
Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGAN LOREN BOLLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLLINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014