skip to content

Bolland, Peter Gerald

CPSO#: 16469

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter G. Bolland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bolland ( CPSO# 16469 )

Business Address:
1265 Clarkson Road North
Mississauga ON  L5J 2W4
Phone Number: (905) 822-9171

Medical Records Location

Address: 1265 Clarkson Rd N Mississauga ON L5S 2W4
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2019