skip to content

Boles, Dina Gaber Sos

CPSO#: 98427

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 2M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dina Boles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boles ( CPSO# 98427 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrooh Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (647) 928-1710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DINA GABER SOS BOLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018