skip to content

Bola, Sundeep Singh

CPSO#: 88327

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7534
Fax: 905-472-7535 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9119
Fax: 416 282-4141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

106 Humber College Blvd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: (416) 742-0681
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bola/Kwon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bola ( CPSO# 88327 )
Dr. S. Kwon ( CPSO# 91454 )

Business Address:
302-1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-1100

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5826

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 471-7534

Business Address:
202-106 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 742-0580

Business Address:
306-1371 Neilsom Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SINGH BOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014