skip to content

Bokhary, Manal Ismail Ibrahem

CPSO#: 88151

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 17 Mar 2008 to 15 May 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2011 to 27 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Nov 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2014