skip to content

Bokhari, Mahmoud Mohammedamin M

CPSO#: 94887

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2065 Finch Avenue West
unit 212
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: 647-477-6151
Fax: 866-692-6954 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD MOHAMMEDAMIN M BOKHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOKHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 May 2011
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2015