skip to content

Bojilov, Borislav Gueorguiev

CPSO#: 100068

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University--Pleven, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2013 to 20 Jun 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016