skip to content

Boissoneau, Mary Lee

CPSO#: 91390

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
63 5th St.
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone: (705) 544-2321
Fax: 705-544-5224 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

132 Bluejay Lane
P.O Box 373
Gogama ON  P0M 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705-363-6890
Fax: 705-264-0443
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Boissoneau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY LEE BOISSONEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOISSONEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013