skip to content

Bohra, Miqdad Hussain

CPSO#: 95280

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:R. N. T. Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Child & Adol Sleep Centre
227 Victoria St
Toronto
617 Victoria Street West
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 703-0505
Fax: (416) 703-0507 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

International Sleep Clinic
West Parrysound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 378-1162 Ext. 3306
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

611 Holly Ave
Suite 205
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 636-9772
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

North Toronto Sleep Centre
4040 Finch Avenue E
Toronto
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 416-293-3233
Fax: 416-293-0692
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Superior Sleep Centre
264 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 7052543312
Fax: 7054506459
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

764B Baker Cres
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Canada
Phone: 613 389 4400
Fax: 6133894450
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bohra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bohra ( CPSO# 95280 )
Dr. C. Kaushik ( CPSO# 107784)

Business Address:
415 Water Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3L9
Phone Number: (705) 748-6687

Business Address:
227 Victoria Street
Lower Level 2
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8

Business Address:
205 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 636-9772

Business Address:
International Sleep Clinic
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 378-1162

Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIQDAD HUSSAIN BOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Mar 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2014