skip to content

Bogoch, Earl Raphael

CPSO#: 27797

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5350
Fax: (416) 359-1601 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EARL RAPHAEL BOGOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGOCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1985