Bogach, Jessica Danielle (CPSO#: 98779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of General Surgery
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton, Ontario
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35921
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA DANIELLE BOGACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016