skip to content

Boga, Amirali Akberali Mohammed

CPSO#: 25080

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Boga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 1900A Eglinton Ave E Scarborough, ON M1L 2L9
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2018