skip to content

Boettcher, Allen David

CPSO#: 30949

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bingham Memorial Hospital
507 8th Ave
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0
Phone: (705) 273-2424 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allen Boettcher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boettcher ( CPSO# 30949 )

Business Address:
507 8th Avenue
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID BOETTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOETTCHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010