skip to content

Bodnar, Michael Larry

CPSO#: 86237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5420 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

3-658 Second Line West
West End Walk-in Clinic
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Canada
Phone: (705) 450-2622
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bodnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bodnar ( CPSO# 86237 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Suite 3
658 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Phone Number: (705) 450-5339

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LARRY BODNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2010