skip to content

Bodkin, Brienne MacDonald

CPSO#: 98629

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional H S C
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

407 - 1265 Arthur St E
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIENNE MACDONALD BODKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 22 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 22 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018