skip to content

Bodie, Gregory Alexander

CPSO#: 89544

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 874-5222
Fax: (705) 874-5224 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G.A. Bodie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bodie ( CPSO# 89544 )

Business Address:
302 - 272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 874-5222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALEXANDER BODIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016