skip to content

Bocking, John Kenneth

CPSO#: 29009

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Kenneth Bocking Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 2010