skip to content

Bocicariu, Alina Marinela

CPSO#: 97638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Laboratory Medicine
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Bocicariu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bocicariu ( CPSO# 97638 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Laboratory Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALINA MARINELA BOCICARIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCICARIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2018