skip to content

Bobiarski, Jerzy Jacek

CPSO#: 85836

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 21 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 22 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013