skip to content

Blitz, Maurice

CPSO#: 90436

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-2903 Pandosy St
Kelowna General Hospital
Department of Surgery - Division of
Kelowna BC  V1Y 1W1
Phone: 4162780008

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Blitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:23 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAURICE BLITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2009