skip to content

Blanchard, Joseph Ulric Bernard Julien

CPSO#: 16559

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1958
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Oct 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1990