skip to content

Blake, Anastasia Marie

CPSO#: 98377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4045 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: 519-376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anastasia Marie Blake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blake ( CPSO# 98377 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANASTASIA MARIE BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014