skip to content

Blajchman, Morris Aaron

CPSO#: 23405

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016