skip to content

Blair, Amy Elizabeth

CPSO#: 86769

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: French, Amy Elizabeth (used until: 19 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Allergy Group
650 Sammon Ave
K-wing, Suite 404
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 465-7999
Fax: (416) 461-8999 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

N E O Kids Health Sciences North
South Tower
1st Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7120 Ext. 3508
Fax: (705) 523-8600
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Eglinton Station Medical Centre
1 Eglinton Ave. E., Suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P3A1
Canada
Phone: 416-485-0555
Fax: 416-485-2555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Blair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blair ( CPSO# 86769 )

Business Address:
Toronto Allergy Group
650 Sammon Avenue
K-Wing, Suite 404
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 465-7999

Business Address:
Eglinton Station Medical Centre
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 485-0555

Business Address:
NEO Kids Health Sciences North
South Tower 1st Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY ELIZABETH BLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012