Blaikley, John Faraday (CPSO#: 99877)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2013 to 29 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2014