skip to content

Blacquiere, Dylan Paul Vincent

CPSO#: 86477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON
K1Y 4E9
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18164
Fax: 613-761-5360 Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9 Tel: 6137614709 Fax: 6137615360
Date Received: 27 Jun 2014


Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 13 May 2014


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DYLAN PAUL VINCENT BLACQUIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACQUIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018