skip to content

Blackstone, Ian Wilfred

CPSO#: 22471

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 224 Everlyn Avenue, Toronto, ON M6P 2Z9
Date Received: 06 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015