skip to content

Blackmore, Elizabeth Jane

CPSO#: 86330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-2368
Fax: 613-548-1374 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quite Health Care
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Canada
Phone: 613-392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Blackmore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blackmore ( CPSO# 86330 )

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009