skip to content

Blackadar, Jonathan Tyler

CPSO#: 100993

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Shores Medical Clinic
10 Maplewood Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone: 705-478-0968
Fax: 705-478-7347 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
PO Box 2500
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Blackadar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Blackadar ( CPSO# 100993)

Business Address:
Northern Shores Medical Clinic
10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone Number: (705) 478-0968

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
P.O. Box 2500
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN TYLER BLACKADAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKADAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015