skip to content

Black, Steven Morton

CPSO#: 26154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Nov 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malton Medical Centre
Suite 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: (905) 677-4200 Ext. 224
Fax: (905) 677-0541 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Steven Morton Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 10 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Aug 2019 Active
             As  from  December  21, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of registration held by Dr. Steven Morton Black,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Black to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Black has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the
                  following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
                  regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs)             X