skip to content

Black, Stephanie Alicia

CPSO#: 93223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
B2-441
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8355
Fax: 519-685-8573 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Black ( CPSO# 93223 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E2-620B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ALICIA BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 15 Oct 2011 to 14 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 15 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 15 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015