skip to content

Blachford, Jean

CPSO#: 31903

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2001