skip to content

Biswas, Robert Neal Krishna

CPSO#: 93432

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Assessment Program
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: 5192575112
Fax: 5192575242 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Biswas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Biswas ( CPSO# 93432 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEAL KRISHNA BISWAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISWAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014