skip to content

Bisland, Stuart Kenward

CPSO#: 92793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Walkerville Medical Practice
2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Suite 106
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: 519 254 5763
Fax: 519 997 3700 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stuart Bisland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bisland ( CPSO# 92793 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:29 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STUART KENWARD BISLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2017