skip to content

Bishop, James Jonathan

CPSO#: 96910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2302 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Algoma Steel
Medical Department
105 West Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B7A4
Canada
Phone: 7059452241
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. K. Babik ( CPSO# 105663)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Dr. James Jonathan Bishop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
105 West Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 7A4
Phone Number: (705) 945-2241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES JONATHAN BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013