skip to content

Bishop, Clare Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30144

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Vaughan, Clare Elizabeth (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jean Pierre Lafleche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bishop ( CPSO# 30144 )
Dr. J. Lafleche ( CPSO# 32987 )

Business Address:
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLARE ELIZABETH BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978