skip to content

Bishara, Michael Wissam

CPSO#: 93222

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1407 Ottawa St
Windsor
Ontario
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (226) 674-1006
Fax: (226) 216-0543 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Wissam Bishara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bishara ( CPSO# 93222 )

Business Address:
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 645-5437

Business Address:
Moy Medical Centre
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone Number: (226) 674-1006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WISSAM BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014