skip to content

Birtwhistle, Richard Vernon

CPSO#: 27238

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Birtwhistle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen's Family Health Team 220 Bagot St Kingston O K7L 5E9
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019