skip to content

Biro, Laurence Steven

CPSO#: 91218

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
Department of Cardiac Surgery
8th Floor, Bond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Laurence Biro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Biro ( CPSO# 91218 )

Business Address:
39 - 2nd Street S. E.
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURENCE STEVEN BIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011