skip to content

Bird, Jeffery Robert

CPSO#: 91133

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Real Time Medical
3rd Floor
7111 Syntex Dr
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Phone: 306-850-4690 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFERY ROBERT BIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 06 Aug 2011 to 05 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 06 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 06 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018