skip to content

Birch, Corey Tyler

CPSO#: 90372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-460 Wellington St
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone: 5196315670
Fax: 5196318570 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Corey T. Birch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015
Corporation Name: Corey T. Birch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Birch ( CPSO# 90372 )

Business Address:
528 Dundas Street East
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone Number: (519) 645-1533

Business Address:
205-450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (226) 777-4580

Business Address:
475 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Phone Number: (519) 631-9040

Business Address:
58 Front Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y6
Phone Number: (519) 205-0637

Business Address:
460 Wellington St
Suite 301
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone Number: 5196315670

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COREY TYLER BIRCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 May 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2011